skip to content

Kashfi, Arash

CPSO#: 90720

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dynamic Medical Center
5734 Yonge St. 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arash Kashfi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kashfi ( CPSO# 90720 )

Business Address:
Greystone Med Center
C1D-8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J2
Phone Number: (416) 266-5888

Business Address:
Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-5421

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 1W-103
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-0066

Business Address:
Dynamic Medical Center
3rd Floor
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARASH KASHFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
AVP - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016