skip to content

Karunakaran Kutty, Patinjareparayil

CPSO#: 29096

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Endoscopy Centre
10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone: (905) 495-5200
Fax: (905) 495-5210 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karunakaran Kutty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Karunakaran Kutty ( CPSO# 29096 )

Business Address:
A7 - 10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200


Corporation Name: Ghori Mulla Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Karunakaran Kutty ( CPSO# 29096 )
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )
Dr. A. Ghori ( CPSO# 105577)
Dr. A. MULLA ( CPSO# 117247)

Business Address:
Shoppers World Medical Centre
144 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATINJAREPARAYIL KARUNAKARAN KUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARUNAKARAN KUTTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1984