skip to content

Karpilow, Craig

CPSO#: 85959

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Feb 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Feb 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-6250
Fax: (905) 526-9745 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Craig Karpilow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Karpilow ( CPSO# 85959 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Indiana
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Apr 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009 Active
             Dr.  Craig  Karpilow  may  practise  medicine independently in family medicine,
            only. 

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 17, 2018, Dr. Karpilow has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 17, 2018, Dr. Karpilow has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)