skip to content

Karnik, Aditya

CPSO#: 98663

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: 519-537-5951 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Karnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Karnik ( CPSO# 60518 )
Dr. A. Karnik ( CPSO# 98663 )

Business Address:
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 257-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295


Corporation Name: A Karnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Karnik ( CPSO# 98663 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADITYA KARNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2015