skip to content

Karkhanechi, Sepideh Sarah

CPSO#: 89083

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Yonge Boulevard
Toronto
Ontario
Toronto ON  M5M 3G8
Phone: 647 210 2132 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sepideh Karkhanechi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karkhanechi ( CPSO# 89083 )

Business Address:
89 Yonge Boulevard
Toronto ON  M5M 3G8
Phone Number: (647) 210-2132

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEPIDEH SARAH KARKHANECHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARKHANECHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015