skip to content

Karimi, Shirin

CPSO#: 100369

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Isfahan University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2017