skip to content

Karim, Sadiqa

CPSO#: 94550

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Sind Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone: (905) 354-1111
Fax: (905) 354-7902 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sadiqa Karim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014 Active
             Dr. Sadiqa Karim may practice medicine independently in family medicine, only.