skip to content

Karim, Sadia

CPSO#: 95238

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Rd
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613)8431718
Fax: (613)8430201 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sadia Karim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karim ( CPSO# 95238 )

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SADIA KARIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2013