skip to content

Karenkova, Natalia

CPSO#: 98413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Jun 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Belarusian State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sennikov and Dr. Karenkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sennikov ( CPSO# 93351 )
Dr. N. Karenkova ( CPSO# 98413 )

Business Address:
390 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 11-12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 882-6566

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
             Dr. Natalia Karenkova may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.