skip to content

Kardash, Sidney

CPSO#: 20703

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 828-9657 Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record can contact: File Bank Tel: 1-800-377-3453
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019


Instructions: Dr. Sidney Kardash has indicated that former patients may email him at skardash@rogers.com to request copies of their medical records
Date Received: 14 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIDNEY KARDASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARDASH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Feb 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969