skip to content

Karatela, Kamran Ahmed

CPSO#: 94953

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Victoria Ave
Chatham
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1
Phone: (905) 456-6816 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Karmy Pain Clinic
164 Queen Street east
Brampton ON  L6V1B4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Karatela, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Karatela ( CPSO# 94953 )

Business Address:
72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.  Kamran Ahmed Karatela may practise:

                  (i)   medicine independently in internal medicine, only; and
                  
                  (ii)  pain  medicine  at the Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic located in
                        Toronto and Brampton,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                        by a supervisor acceptable  to  the College, and only in accordance
                        with the Change of Scope Program approved by the College.
                  
            2.    The authority to practice in clause 1(ii)  automatically expires upon the
                  following   events,   unless  the  Registration  Committee   renews   the
                  certificate with or without  additional  or  other  terms, conditions and
                  limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Karatela's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Karatela's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report,  pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Karatela's practice unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (iv)  Dr.  Karatela is no longer participating in  the  Change  of  Scope
                        Program.