skip to content

Karas, Yair

CPSO#: 27261

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Hebrew University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Eye Associates Of Don Mills 201 - 6 Maginn Mews North York, ON M3C 0G9 Phone: (416) 447-4611
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018