skip to content

Karanjia, Rustum Sarosh

CPSO#: 88911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 738-7100 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karanjia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2021
Corporation Name: Karanjia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Karanjia ( CPSO# 88911 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUSTUM SAROSH KARANJIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARANJIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016