skip to content

Karamchandani, Jason Raj Paul

CPSO#: 95863

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Stanford University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 30 Bond Street Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 17 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016