skip to content

Karaddi Venkatanarasimha, Nanda Kumar

CPSO#: 94261

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Bangalore University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011