skip to content

Kara, Ali Alnoor

CPSO#: 96559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham, Ontario
N0G 2W0
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Canada
Phone: (519) 357-3210
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford, Ontario
N5A 2Y6
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kara ( CPSO# 96559 )

Business Address:
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-0100

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI ALNOOR KARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Oct 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2013 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: October 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Ali Alnoor Kara was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Care or control of a motor vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to Section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: September 11, 2017
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Victim Surcharge of $300.