skip to content

Kapusta, Christopher James

CPSO#: 101148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General and Marine
Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Meaford General Hospital
229 Nelson St. W.
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 538-1311
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

8 Harbour Street West
Collingwood ON  L9Y 5B4
Canada
Phone: (705) 444-9898
Fax: (705) 444-0633
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

170 Colborne Street W.
Orillia ON  L3V2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Kapusta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kapusta ( CPSO# 101148)

Business Address:
170 Colbourne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
8 Harbour Street West
Collingwood ON  L9Y 5B4
Phone Number: (705) 444-9898

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Phone Number: (519) 538-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES KAPUSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015