skip to content

Kapur, Shiv

CPSO#: 94998

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43208 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood general and marine
hospital
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

GEORGIAN BAY GENERAL HOSPITAL
1112 ST ANDREWS DRIVE
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shiv Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kapur ( CPSO# 94998 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:28 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active
 Dr.  Shiv  Kapur  may  practice medicine independently in anatomical pathology,
            only.