skip to content

Kapur, Prem Lal

CPSO#: 18973

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Prem Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2006