skip to content

Kappagantula, Mythri

CPSO#: 97070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Westboro Medical Clinic
190 Richmond Road
Ottawa Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1Z 6W6
Phone: (613) 719-7837
Fax: (613) 719-7813 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MYTHRI KAPPAGANTULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPPAGANTULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Dec 2011 to 23 Dec 2011
EL - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013