skip to content

Kapoor, Pankaj Vimal

CPSO#: 86745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mysore University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue, suite 366
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 973-1133
Fax: (519) 973-1255 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington Sleep Clinic
33 Princess Street
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 325-1333
Fax: (519) 325-1338
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

17 Park Avenue East
Chatham ON  N7M 3V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-7378
Fax: (519) 352-7376
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

1258 Michigan Avenue
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Canada
Phone: (519) 332-5333
Fax: (519) 332-5444
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kapoor ( CPSO# 86745 )

Business Address:
366 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 2Z2
Phone Number: (519) 973-1133


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:12 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011 Active
             Dr. Pankaj Vimal Kapoor may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.