skip to content

Kaplan-Myrth, Nili

CPSO#: 88438

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 Fourth Ave
Ottawa ON  K1S 2L3
Phone: (613) 695-6687
Fax: (613) 695-6689 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Kaplan-Myrth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaplan-Myrth ( CPSO# 88438 )

Business Address:
109 Fourth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 2L3
Phone Number: (613) 695-6687

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NILI KAPLAN-MYRTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLAN-MYRTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011