skip to content

Kapijimpanga, Lowesha Bedgers

CPSO#: 26362

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2013