Kaphengst, Karla J (CPSO#: 96866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Sep 2011

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KDCHC
44 Francis Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 2A2
Phone: 519-745-4404
Fax: 519-745-3709
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Nevada

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Karla  J Kaphengst may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.