skip to content

Kapalanga, Nyolima Joachim Bill

CPSO#: 90364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Acholi, English, Lingala, Other, Swahili

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 8226
8-2 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2854
Fax: (519) 378-1583 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Kapalanga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kapalanga ( CPSO# 90364 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
Unit 8-2
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island
USA - Connecticut
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:16 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2012 Active
 Dr. Nyolima Joachim Bill Kapalanga may practise medicine independently in
                  paediatrics, only.