skip to content

Kannu, Peter

CPSO#: 90328

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:University of Otago, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Clinical and Metabolic Genetics
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5340
Fax: (416) 813-5345 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Peter Kannu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Kannu holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Kannu no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.