skip to content

Kang, Xian

CPSO#: 91185

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3101
222 King St E.
Bowmanville ON  L1C1P6
Phone: 9056976446
Fax: 9056972552 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 510
330 Hwy #7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 7075007
Fax: (905)7075008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Xian Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Kang ( CPSO# 91185 )

Business Address:
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Brownsville ON  L1C 1P6

Business Address:
3101-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: 9056976446

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XIAN KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014