skip to content

Kandel, Sonja Marion

CPSO#: 94911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hamburg University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4081
Fax: (416) 323-7325 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sonja Marion Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kandel ( CPSO# 94911 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:28 Aug 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:07 May 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 17 May 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 18 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2021 Active
 Dr. SONJA MARION KANDEL may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.