skip to content

Kandasamy, Gengatharan

CPSO#: 90282

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 9
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone: (905) 426-5050
Fax: (905) 426-5077 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

78 - 20 New Delhi Dr
Markham ON  L3S 0B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 294-4489
Fax: (905) 294-4479
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gengatharan Kandasamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandasamy ( CPSO# 90282 )

Business Address:
9 - 1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-5050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 08 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active
             Dr.  Gengatharan  Kandasamy  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine.