skip to content

Kanbur, Nuray Oksuz

CPSO#: 86874

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Apr 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hacettepe University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:09 Mar 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2021 Active
 1. Dr. NURAY OKSUZ KANBUR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. KANBUR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. KANBUR no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 09 March, 2021, and expires on 30 April, 2023. Upon renewal of Dr. KANBUR's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.