skip to content

Kanagaratnam, Sivaruban

CPSO#: 91744

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 09 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Moscow State University of Medicine & De, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
EL - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
EL - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2014