skip to content

Kanagalingam, Ambi

CPSO#: 99736

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 18 May 2014
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 May 2014