skip to content

Kanaan, Hassan Diab

CPSO#: 97304

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beaumont Hospital
Department of pathology
3601 west thirteen mile rd
Royal Oak MI  48073
United States
Phone: 248-898-9069

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hassan Kanaan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:17 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active
 Dr.  Hassan Diab Kanaan may practise medicine independently in anatomical
                  pathology, only.