skip to content

Kamminga, Amanda Maria

CPSO#: 89073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
131 Frederick Campbell St
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amanda Kamminga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kamminga ( CPSO# 89073 )

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3
Phone Number: 519-843-2010

Business Address:
6420 Beatty Line North
Fergus ON  N1m 2W3
Phone Number: 519-843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA MARIA KAMMINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMMINGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010