skip to content

Kamitakahara, Ernest George

CPSO#: 26164

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019