skip to content

Kamal, Ramy

CPSO#: 97848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 O'Brien St
Orillia ON  L3V 5S3
Phone: (705) 327-3330 Ext. 3
Fax: (705) 327-7675 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ramy Kamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kamal ( CPSO# 97848 )

Business Address:
40 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S3
Phone Number: (705) 327-3330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMY KAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014