skip to content

Kalu, Uduma Onuka

CPSO#: 28035

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:George Washington University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Uduma Kalu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS P.O. Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Telephone: 705-560-8461 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 3 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kalu has agreed to resign from the College as of April 30, 2015 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.