skip to content

Kale, Rajendra Dhundiraj

CPSO#: 90060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Division of Neurology
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17932 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:04 Dec 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
 Dr.  Rajendra  Dhundiraj  Kale  may  practise  medicine  independently in
                  neurology, only.