skip to content

Kalaniti, Kaarthigeyan

CPSO#: 96389

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017