skip to content

Kalaichandran, Amitha

CPSO#: 98748

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 16 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Rd, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMITHA KALAICHANDRAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KALAICHANDRAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. KALAICHANDRAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KALAICHANDRAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KALAICHANDRAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KALAICHANDRAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KALAICHANDRAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019