skip to content

Kakani, Nirmal Kumar

CPSO#: 87529

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2014