skip to content

Kakalia, Spenta J

CPSO#: 85144

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMH Medical College
Abdur Rehman Road
Lahore 540000
Pakistan
Phone: 92-42-3660-555

Additional Practice Location(s)

84 Tipu Block
Garden Town
Lahore 54700
Pakistan
Pakistan
Phone: 92-42-3583-281
County: 
Electoral District: 

212-4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Canada
Phone: 416-497-1987
Fax: 416-497-0712
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 208
586 Eglington Avenue E.
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SPENTA J KAKALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008