skip to content

Kak, Ipshita

CPSO#: 97891

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35010
Fax: (905) 521-6192 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IPSHITA KAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - General Pathology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018