skip to content

Kain, Brian Forrester

CPSO#: 24651

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Forrester Kain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 15, 2016:

Clinical deficiencies in Dr. Kain’s practice have been identified. As a result, Dr. Kain has resigned from the College effective October 31, 2016 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.