skip to content

Kahn, Michael Khubbab

CPSO#: 85650

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Sep 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth Street, 3EN-462
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Fax: 4163403698 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Corporation Name: Michael Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
3EN-462, 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3227

Business Address:
146 Oliver Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 0J7
Phone Number: (613) 507-7246


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KHUBBAB KAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2006