skip to content

Kahlon, Amrit

CPSO#: 85138

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016