skip to content

Kagoma, Yoan Katongole

CPSO#: 97666

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb St
Group Health Centre
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 905-387-4551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road, Suite 103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: 905-828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Credit Valley X-Ray & Ultrasound
6590 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2R5
Canada
Phone: 905-812-1066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West St
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: 519-426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main St E
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: 905-945-2253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

100 Nipissing Rd
Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre - M
Milton ON  L9T 5B2
Canada
Phone: (289) 350-2560
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kagoma and Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kagoma ( CPSO# 97666 )
Dr. A. Farag ( CPSO# 105941)

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital (Radiology)
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital (Radiology)
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YOAN KATONGOLE KAGOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGOMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2018