skip to content

Kafka, Henryk Peter

CPSO#: 29419

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6255
Fax: (613) 548-1368 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

18 NEWBERRY STREET
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Canada
Phone: 613 966 4377
Fax: 613 966 4730
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Henryk Kafka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kafka ( CPSO# 29419 )

Business Address:
Weeneebayko Authority Health Area
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 34
Moose Factory ON  P2L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
Cardiology Services Group
18 Newberry Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone Number: (613) 966-4377

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HENRYK PETER KAFKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAFKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977