skip to content

Lai, Kafai

CPSO#: 91806

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Champagne Dr Unit C8
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: 4163981515
Fax: 4163981516 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

755 Queensway E Unit 3
Mississauga ON  L4Y4C5
Canada
Phone: 9058975454
Fax: 9058977494
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

7335 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  L3T1P9
Canada
Phone: 9057077309
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3857 Lakeshore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON  M8W3P7
Canada
Phone: 4163542640
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

401-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Canada
Phone: 4166150000
Fax: 4166152200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kafai Lai & Alice Sau Han Kam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kam ( CPSO# 91421 )
Dr. K. Lai ( CPSO# 91806 )

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Business Address:
3rd Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 282-9200

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAFAI LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009