skip to content

Kadiri, Yahaya Zekeri

CPSO#: 30260

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical Chronic Pain Clinic
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 830 0667
Fax: 905 853 0200 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 28 Nov 2019 Active
             As from November 28, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Yahaya Zekeri Kadiri
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kadiri to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. YAHAYA ZEKERI KADIRI
                                          ("Dr. Kadiri")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Kadiri, certificate of registration number 30260, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1102344 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anesthesia
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College will also deliver a
                  caution in person.



            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Kadiri, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kadiri, undertake that I will restrict my practice to
                        chronic pain management without intravenous sedation and will not
                        engage in general anesthesia or administer or prescribe intravenous
                        procedural sedation.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kadiri, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kadiri, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kadiri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and Appendix "B",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kadiri, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kadiri
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
                              the practice of anesthesia.  As a result of the
                              investigation, Dr. Kadiri has restricted his practice to
                              chronic pain management without intravenous sedation and will
                              not engage in general anesthesia or administer or prescribe
                              intravenous procedural sedation.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Kadiri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2010
Summary:

 On July 14, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kadiri had committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
 Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Dr. Kadiri engaged in a shouting match 
 with a surgeon outside of the operating room, in front of other people, lasting for several 
 minutes.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar impose the 
 following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kadiri's certificate of registration:

(i)	Dr. 
 Kadiri shall successfully complete, at his own expense, a College approved Communications Course 
 and shall provide proof thereof to the College.  This term, condition and limitation shall remain 
 in place until Dr. Kadiri has provided satisfactory proof to the College of his successful 
 completion of the approved Communications Course.

2.	Dr. Kadiri appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.	Dr. Kadiri pay to the College costs in the amount of $3650 within 6 months of the 
 date of this Order. 

4.	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2010

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 28, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Yahaya Zekeri Kadiri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 28, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kadiri engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of anesthesia. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Kadiri has restricted his practice to chronic pain management without intravenous sedation and will not engage in general anesthesia or administer or prescribe intravenous procedural sedation.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)